This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:15:24 (UTC).

Young v. Drury University

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Young filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Drury University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05718

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Young

Defendant

Drury University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb

Attorney at Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.

150 E. 18 St., Suite Phr

New York, NY 10003

Defendant Attorney

Peter T. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/28/2020) Drury University answer due 9/25/2020 (ks) Modified on 9/2/2020 (ks). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter T. Shapiro dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Drury University served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by Bonnie Welcox, designated. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/24/2020) (rj) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drury University..(pc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Drury University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Drury University. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20817569)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/28/2020) Drury University answer due 9/25/2020 (ks) Modified on 9/2/2020 (ks). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter T. Shapiro dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Drury University served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by Bonnie Welcox, designated. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/24/2020) (rj) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drury University..(pc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Drury University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Drury University. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20817569)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less