This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 08:12:30 (UTC).

YOUNG v. CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 YOUNG filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07452

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENISE YOUNG

Defendants

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC

XYZ COMPANY 1-4

ABC CORPORATION 1-5

JOHN DOES 1-10

JANE DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CECILE DELROSE PORTILLA

Defendant Attorneys

JUSTIN T. NASTRO

WILLIAM H. YOST, III

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Letter from William H. Yost re #5 MOTION to Remand . (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by DENISE YOUNG re #5 MOTION to Remand FIRST MOTION BRIEF AT # 5 IS WITHDRAWN AS FILED IN ERROR. BRIEF AT # 6 IS THE CORRECT BRIEF (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by DENISE YOUNG REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand by DENISE YOUNG. (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

5 #13

Exhibit EX I Picture of Name on Restaurant

5 #12

Exhibit Ex H Defendant's Service of Answer

5 #11

Exhibit EX G defendant's Answer

5 #10

Exhibit EX F postal Receipt

5 #9

Exhibit EX E Certified mail receipt

5 #8

Exhibit EX D NOTICE OF CLAIM

5 #7

Exhibit Ex C Certification of service of summons and complaint

5 #6

Exhibit EX B Service acknowledgement

5 #5

Exhibit Ex A Notice of removal

5 #4

Certification Service proof of motion

5 #3

Exhibit Proposed Order

5 #2

Statement Certification of Counsel

5 #1

Brief Brief in support of Remand

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand by DENISE YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of Remand, #2 Statement Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order, #4 Certification Service proof of motion, #5 Exhibit Ex A Notice of removal, #6 Exhibit EX B Service acknowledgement, #7 Exhibit Ex C Certification of service of summons and complaint, #8 Exhibit EX D NOTICE OF CLAIM, #9 Exhibit EX E Certified mail receipt, #10 Exhibit EX F postal Receipt, #11 Exhibit EX G defendant's Answer, #12 Exhibit Ex H Defendant's Service of Answer, #13 Exhibit EX I Picture of Name on Restaurant)(PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from William H. Yost re #5 MOTION to Remand . (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by DENISE YOUNG re #5 MOTION to Remand FIRST MOTION BRIEF AT # 5 IS WITHDRAWN AS FILED IN ERROR. BRIEF AT # 6 IS THE CORRECT BRIEF (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by DENISE YOUNG REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 2/21/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #6 Supplemental Brief filed by CECILE PORTILLA as to #5 Motion to Remand was entered incorrectly as a motion. The motion will be terminated as to D.E. 6, and the supplemental brief will be considered - such as it is - by the court. Additionally, this submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Brief" located in the Motions and Related Filings menu. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by DENISE YOUNG re #5 MOTION to Remand THE FIRST MOTION BRIEF WAS UPLOADED IN ERROR.. THE CORRECT BRIEF HAS BEEN UPLOADED AT ENTRY # 6 ON THE DOCKET (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand by DENISE YOUNG. (PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by DENISE YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of Remand, #2 Statement Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order, #4 Certification Service proof of motion, #5 Exhibit Ex A Notice of removal, #6 Exhibit EX B Service acknowledgement, #7 Exhibit Ex C Certification of service of summons and complaint, #8 Exhibit EX D NOTICE OF CLAIM, #9 Exhibit EX E Certified mail receipt, #10 Exhibit EX F postal Receipt, #11 Exhibit EX G defendant's Answer, #12 Exhibit Ex H Defendant's Service of Answer, #13 Exhibit EX I Picture of Name on Restaurant)(PORTILLA, CECILE) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketJudge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC. (NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC. (NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-005359-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13913493), filed by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL OF COLORADO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Answer, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Demand)(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less