This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:32:42 (UTC).

Young v. Baldwin Aviation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Young filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Baldwin Aviation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02901

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher B. Young

Boulder, CO 80301

Defendants

Baldwin Aviation, Inc.

Baldwin Aviation, LLC

Baldwin Safety and Compliance

Baldwin Aviation LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ryan Paul Lessmann

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC-Denver

950 17Th Street, Suite 2600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 November 2020. Before the Court is the parties' Notice of Settlement (ECF #13 ). In light of the Notice, the Scheduling Conference set for November 9, 2020 is vacated. The parties shall file dismissal papers on or before December 23, 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc. (Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#12

(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 October 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #11 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before November 3, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #2 Complaint by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 October 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #9 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #5 ) is discharged. The above-captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c). The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #4 ) on or before October 27, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 9, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

9 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H

9 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G

9 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

9 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

9 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#5

(#5) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before October 13, 2020, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to #10 on 10/14/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct PDF on 9/24/2020 (jtorr, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Baldwin Aviation, Inc., filed by Christopher B. Young.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 November 2020. Before the Court is the parties' Notice of Settlement (ECF #13 ). In light of the Notice, the Scheduling Conference set for November 9, 2020 is vacated. The parties shall file dismissal papers on or before December 23, 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc. (Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 October 2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #11 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before November 3, 2020.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #2 Complaint by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 October 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #9 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #5 ) is discharged. The above-captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c). The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #4 ) on or before October 27, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 9, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing State Court Registry of Actions by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Registry of Actions)(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 October 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #6 . Defendant indicates that it will file a response to this Court's Order to Show Cause (ECF #5 ) on or before October 13, 2020. For good cause shown, the Court grants Defendant's motion. Based on Defendant's response to the Order to Show Cause, if the Order is discharged, Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before seven days following that discharge.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #2 Complaint by Defendant Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before October 13, 2020, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to #10 on 10/14/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct PDF on 9/24/2020 (jtorr, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Baldwin Aviation, Inc., filed by Christopher B. Young.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baldwin Aviation, Inc. from District Court, Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV000258. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7505930), filed by Baldwin Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - District Court Civil Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Report, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Donald E. Baldwin, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lessmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less