This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 08:40:44 (UTC).

Young v. Ashford University, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Young filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Ashford University, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05830

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Young

Defendant

Ashford University, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb

Attorney at Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.

150 E. 18 St., Suite Phr

New York, NY 10003

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement with prejudice. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ashford University, LLC served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service was accepted by Peter Cayetano, Agent, CT Corp.. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashford University, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashford University, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashford University, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20868554)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement with prejudice. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ashford University, LLC served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service was accepted by Peter Cayetano, Agent, CT Corp.. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashford University, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashford University, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashford University, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20868554)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb