This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:24:31 (UTC).

Young v. Aramark Correctional Service LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Young filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Aramark Correctional Service LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C. Nugent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02823

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C. Nugent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron E. Young

Mansfield, OH 44901

Defendants

Ryan James

Aramark Correctional Service LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

R. Leland Evans

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote - Columbus

250 Civic Center Drive

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Exhibit 5- Progress Michigan Web Page

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660119403. Filed by Aaron E. Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Mark Holmes, #3 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3- Grievance, #5 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Jamal Malone, #6 Exhibit 5- Progress Michigan Web Page, #7 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Kyle Perry, #8 Summons, #9 Envelope) (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. (Evans, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2- Complaint

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Aramark Correctional Service LLC, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website states item arrived at the Philadelphia, PA 19104 post office on 12/12/2019 and is ready for pickup, filed on behalf of Aaron E. Young Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Kyle Perry

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Mark Holmes

1 #4

Exhibit 3- Grievance

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

1 #5

Exhibit 4- Declaration of Jamal Malone

1 #8

Summons

1 #9

Envelope

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Marion Correctional, Ryan James, date on green card is 11/10/19, service date on USPS website is 12/10/2019. Filed on behalf of Aaron E. Young. Related document(s) #2 (S,AN) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. (Evans, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Aramark Correctional Service LLC, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website states item arrived at the Philadelphia, PA 19104 post office on 12/12/2019 and is ready for pickup, filed on behalf of Aaron E. Young Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Marion Correctional, Ryan James, date on green card is 11/10/19, service date on USPS website is 12/10/2019. Filed on behalf of Aaron E. Young. Related document(s) #2 (S,AN) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Receipt # 70190700000166798940 and Ryan James Receipt # 70190700000166798933 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail.. (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Aramark Correctional Service LLC, Ryan James. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660119403. Filed by Aaron E. Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Mark Holmes, #3 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3- Grievance, #5 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Jamal Malone, #6 Exhibit 5- Progress Michigan Web Page, #7 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Kyle Perry, #8 Summons, #9 Envelope) (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.