This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2022 at 08:39:53 (UTC).

Young v. Ahern Rentals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Young filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ahern Rentals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Conrad, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

John Matthew Young

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ahern Rentals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Brandon Gaskins

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen PLLC

78 Wentworth Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Sarah Hayward Negus

Attorney at Moore and Van Allen

100 N. Tryon Street, Suite 4700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Taylor Paige Festa

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen

100 N Tryon St, Ste 4700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

William H. Foster, III

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

110 E. Court Street, Suite 201

Greenville, SC 29601

Kevin Cleys

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

100 North Tryon Street, Suite 4150

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Exhibit Order from District of Nevada

23 #23

Main Document

22 #1

Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#21

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by John Matthew Young. Replies due by 12/28/2021 (Negus, Sarah) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

20 #1

Exhibit A - Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to D

20 #20

Main Document

19 #19

Main Document

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Mike Vawter

3 #1

Exhibit A - Non-Competition, Non-Solicitation and Non-Disclosure Agreement

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#19) Supplemental Memorandum by Ahern Rentals, Inc. as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF 1 for District of Nevada Filing)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice to State Court

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order from District of Nevada)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply re PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE. Replies due by 12/30/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/22/2021. (DLG) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by John Matthew Young. Replies due by 12/28/2021 (Negus, Sarah) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief. Plaintiff shall filed its brief within three days of this Order. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/18/2021. (DLG) (Entered: 12/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by John Matthew Young. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue) (Negus, Sarah). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Supplemental Memorandum by Ahern Rentals, Inc. as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF 1 for District of Nevada Filing)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Matthew Young. (Negus, Sarah) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward Brandon Gaskins for John Matthew Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/9/2021. (mek) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to E. Brandon Gaskins Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5352231. by John Matthew Young. (Festa, Taylor). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #8 Motion to Stay. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/18/2021. (DLG) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against John Matthew Young by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Competition, Non-Solicitation and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 10, 2021 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 11, 2021 Order)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Matthew Young. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Non-Competition Agreement) (Negus, Sarah) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Paige Festa on behalf of John Matthew Young (Festa, Taylor) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Competition, Non-Solicitation and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mike Vawter)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, Mecklenburg County, case number 21-CVS-16148. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5312180), filed by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration)(Cleys, Kevin) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AHERN RENTALS INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H Foster, III