This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:33:04 (UTC).

Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04044

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer doing business as Spencer Family YMCA

Defendants

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen F Avery

Attorney at Cornwall Avery Bjornstad Scott

407 Grand Avenue, Po Box 999

Spencer, IA 51301-0999

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin M Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Alexandra Galbraith

Attorney at Lederer Weston Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/1/2021. (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#3

(#3) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#4

(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see New Removal Case Packet attached. (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Galbraith on behalf of The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Galbraith, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Until October 20, 2021 by Defendants The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Defendants' #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Response due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/13/2021. (jjh) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Hartford Steam Boiler by Plaintiff Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer. (Avery, Stephen) Modified to term as Motion per MAR Chambers on 10/19/2021 (jag) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer (Avery, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Failure to appear for this status conference could result in sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/26/2021. (skm) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/29/2021. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/29/2021. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Failure to appear for this status conference could result in sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/26/2021. (skm) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer (Avery, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Hartford Steam Boiler by Plaintiff Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer. (Avery, Stephen) Modified to term as Motion per MAR Chambers on 10/19/2021 (jag) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer due from The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company and West Bend Mutual Insurance Company on 10/20/2021 pursuant to #7 Order. (jjh) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting Defendants' #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Response due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/13/2021. (jjh) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Until October 20, 2021 by Defendants The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Galbraith on behalf of The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Galbraith, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Defendants West Bend Mutual Insurance Company and The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 10/21/2021. Plaintiff Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/1/2021 (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see New Removal Case Packet attached. (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Young Men's Christian Association of Spencer (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/1/2021. (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Clay County District Court, case number CVCV034278. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3540278), filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company, The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST BEND MUTUAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston