This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 09:25:27 (UTC).

Young et al v. Gonzalez et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Young filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gonzalez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant

Brian O'Neil Young

Intervenor Plaintiff

Perla Judith Romero

Defendants

Reinaldo Lopez Gonzalez

Day Express LLC

Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Anne Kinder

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Geoffrey E Schorr

A Jared Aldinger

Hutton W Sentell

Defendant Attorneys

David L Sargent

Christine Kirchner

Michael Wayne Johnston

William Edward McMichael

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

Carlos A Balido

 

Court Documents

10 #5

Exhibit(s) E

10 #4

Exhibit(s) D

10 #3

Exhibit(s) C

10 #2

Exhibit(s) B

10 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#10

(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC re #9 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC re: #6 First MOTION to Remand , #5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit(s)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Remand filed by Brian O'Neil Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Kinder, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Sanctions filed by Perla Judith Romero. (Schorr, Geoffrey) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 #8

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F - Notice of Related Case

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E - List of Counsel of Record

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C - Copy of Each Document Filed in State Court Action

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Copy of Docket Sheet from State Court Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12879291) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Copy of Docket Sheet from State Court Action, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Copy of Each Document Filed in State Court Action, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit(s) E - List of Counsel of Record, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Notice of Related Case, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC re #9 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC re: #6 First MOTION to Remand , #5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. Amended List of Counsel of Record. (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Remand filed by Brian O'Neil Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Kinder, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Sanctions filed by Perla Judith Romero. (Schorr, Geoffrey) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) G) (Kirchner, Christine) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The notice of removal [Doc. No. 1] fails to establish subject-matter jurisdiction because it does not properly plead diversity of citizenship for the LLC parties. The Court ORDERS the defendants to file an amended notice of removal properly alleging the citizenship of all members of all LLC parties within 21 days of this order. Failure to follow this order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/9/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (see document #1 for image). (sxf) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Hartford Specialty Insurance Services of Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12879291) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Copy of Docket Sheet from State Court Action, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Copy of Each Document Filed in State Court Action, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit(s) E - List of Counsel of Record, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Notice of Related Case, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less