This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:23 (UTC).

Younes v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Younes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01796

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mona Younes

Defendant

Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nhan Huynh Nguyen

Attorney at Law Office of Nhan H Nguyen, PC

2500 W Loop S, Ste 340

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

Martin R Sadler

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

801 Travis Street, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Christine Reifschneider Edwards

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al

801 Travis St, Ste 1800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Exhibit

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Civil Court at Law No. 4, case number 1128590 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22447032) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit)(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Civil Court at Law No. 4, case number 1128590 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22447032) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit)(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.