This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 07:56:53 (UTC).

Yost v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Yost filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sallie J Yost

Defendants

EQUIFAX

DISCOVER

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

DISCOVER BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIELLEN CYNTHIA BEAM EDINBURG

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT GITMEID & ASSOC PLLC

3411 Silverside Rd Suite 104-204

Wilmington, DE 19810

Defendant Attorneys

JAKOB F. WILLIAMS

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Ste 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ZACHARY M. KIMMEL

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

Two Commerce Sq, 2001 Market St Sutie 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JENNY PERKINS

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1735 Market St 51St Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

ELANOR A. MULHERN

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1735 Market St 51St Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sallie J Yost As To Discover Bank(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ZACHARY M. KIMMEL on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC(KIMMEL, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ANSWER BY 5/14/2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/15/21. 4/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sallie J Yost (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/7/21. 4/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY M. KIMMEL on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(KIMMEL, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELANOR A. MULHERN on behalf of DISCOVER BANK with Certificate of Service(MULHERN, ELANOR) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNY PERKINS on behalf of DISCOVER BANK with Certificate of Service(PERKINS, JENNY) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/23/21. 3/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Designation Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14983733.), filed by Sallie J Yost. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sallie J Yost As To Discover Bank(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ZACHARY M. KIMMEL on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC(KIMMEL, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ANSWER BY 5/14/2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/15/21. 4/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sallie J Yost (EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/7/21. 4/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY M. KIMMEL on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(KIMMEL, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELANOR A. MULHERN on behalf of DISCOVER BANK with Certificate of Service(MULHERN, ELANOR) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNY PERKINS on behalf of DISCOVER BANK with Certificate of Service(PERKINS, JENNY) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/23/21. 3/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Forwarded To: MARIELLEN CYNTHIA BEAM EDINBURG on 3/16/21 (fdc, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sallie J Yost. (md, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14983733.), filed by Sallie J Yost. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(EDINBURG, MARIELLEN) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant