This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2021 at 09:01:38 (UTC).

York et al v. Dave & Buster's Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 York filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Dave Buster's Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01130

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gery Pearson

Natasha York

Defendants

Dave & Buster's Management Corporation Incorporated

Dave & Buster's Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alanna Klein Fischer

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Anthony James Lazzaro

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Don J Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77006

Lori Marie Griffin

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn B Blakey

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Dallas, TX

2001 Ross Ave., Ste. 1500

Dallas, TX 75201-2931

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

9 #1

Additional Summons request

#9

8 #1

Consent Forms

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dave & Buster's Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Dave & Busters Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Dave & Busters Entertainment, Inc., for Dave & Buster's Incorporated. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dave & Buster's Incorporated.(Oller, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kathryn B Blakey on behalf of Defendants Dave & Buster's Incorporated, Dave & Buster's Management Corporation Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Collection and Class Action Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #12 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/29/2021. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Dave & Buster's Incorporated, Dave & Buster's Management Corporation Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Dave & Buster's Incorporated, Dave & Buster's Management Corporation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oller, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alanna Klein Fischer on behalf of Plaintiffs Gery Pearson, Natasha York. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anthony James Lazzaro on behalf of Plaintiffs Gery Pearson, Natasha York. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gery Pearson, Natasha York: Proof of Service re: Plaintiff's Collective Action and Class Action Complaint upon Dave & Buster's, Inc.; and Dave & Buster's Management Corp., Inc. on July 7, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service for Dave & Busters Management Corp., Inc.)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Anthony James Lazzaro terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Gery Pearson, Natasha York. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons request)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE re: of Filing Consents to Join Wage Claim by Gery Pearson, Natasha York . (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 28, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/30/2021. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/30/2021. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Don J Foty, Lori Marie Griffin on behalf of Plaintiffs Gery Pearson, Natasha York. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney notified pro hac vice incorrectly filed and it has been correct refiled and filing fee paid. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Don J. Foty by Gery Pearson, Natasha York. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Gery Pearson, Natasha York. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19615626. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1130-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19615626 filed by Natasha York and Gery Pearson. (Foty, Don) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(DLC) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dave & Buster's Management Corporation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alanna Klein Fischer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Don Foty