This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 16:05:09 (UTC).

York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund et al v. Rambo et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Rambo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard Seeborg, Edward J. Davila and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00994

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judges

Richard Seeborg

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund

Defendants

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Lebenthal & Co., LLC

Barry Lawson Williams

Barbara L. Rambo

Dinyar B. Mistry

Roger H. Kimmel

Wells Fargo Securities, LLC

Lewis Chew

CIBC World Markets Corp.

Anne Shen Smith

MFR Securities, Inc.

TD Securities (USA) LLC

Richard A. Meserve

Barclays Capital Inc.

SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.

Maryellen C. Herringer

BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC

Williams Capital Group, L.P.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren Jay Robbins

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas C. Michaud

Attorney at Vanoverbeke Michaud and Timmony, P.C.

79 Alfred Street

Detroit, MI 48201

Shawn A. Williams

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian Edward Cochran

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Christopher Jam Hogg

Attorney at Davis Polk and Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Dana M. Seshens

Attorney at Davis Polk and Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Neal Alan Potischman

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Craig Cagney

Attorney at Davis Polk and Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Charles S. Duggan

Attorney at Davis Polk and Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

Willow E. Radcliffe

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kenneth Joseph Black

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#102

#101

#100

97 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#97

96 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#96

95 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#95

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER Granting #97 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Craig T Cagney. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) ORDER Granting #96 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Dana M. Seshens. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) ORDER Granting #95 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Charles S. Duggan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER RELATING/CONSOLIDATING CASE to 5:18-cv-03509-EJD and C19-00994. The complaint filed in the York County Securities Action, and that all other dates, including the initial case management conference and deadlines scheduled for May 16, 2019 in the York County Securities Action are VACATED., Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Craig T. Cagney (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13325866) filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cagney, Craig) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Dana M. Seshens (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13325828) filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seshens, Dana) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Charles S. Duggan (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13325757) filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Duggan, Charles) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Brian Edward Cochran on behalf of York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Darren Jay Robbins on behalf of York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund re #6 Summons Issued,,,, BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund re #6 Summons Issued,,,, BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund re #6 Summons Issued,,,, Blaylock Van, LLC (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund re #6 Summons Issued,,,, Barclays Capital Inc. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Lewis Chew, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Fred J. Fowler, Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC, Great Pacific Securities, Maryellen C. Herringer, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Dinyar B. Mistry, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Eric D. Mullins, Rosendo G. Parra, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Barbara L. Rambo, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Anne Shen Smith, Nickolas Stavropoulos, TD Securities (USA) LLC, David S. Thomason, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Barry Lawson Williams, Geisha J. Williams, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 2/22/2019) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 2/22/2019) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of the Securities Act of 1933; Demand for Jury Trial against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Lewis Chew, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Fred J. Fowler, Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC, Great Pacific Securities, Maryellen C. Herringer, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc. f/k/a Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Dinyar B. Mistry, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Eric D. Mullins, Rosendo G. Parra, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Barbara L. Rambo, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Anne Shen Smith, Nickolas Stavropoulos, TD Securities (USA) LLC, David S. Thomason, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Barry Lawson Williams, Geisha J. Williams, Williams Capital Group, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13114731.). Filed by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MFR Securities, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BNY MELLON CAPITAL MARKETS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Williams Capital Group, L.P. is a litigant