This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 08:29:34 (UTC).

Yoomi Babytech, Inc. v. Anvyl, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Yoomi Babytech, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anvyl, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07933

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yoomi Babytech, Inc.

Defendants

VitalPure, LLC

Rodney Manzo

Feel Well, LLC

Anvyl, Inc.

Legacy Chemical Corporation

Trustees

SVB Financial Group

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., d/b/a CHASE BANK

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan David Plaut

Attorney at Chardon Law Offices

One State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant Attorneys

David George Keyko

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

James Durand Dealy

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Stephanie Gomez

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

5 #7

Admission letter

5 #6

Yellow bottles

5 #5

E-mail from Anvyl

5 #4

Wires

5 #3

Purchase Order

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jar) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held by telephone on December 9, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' letter by December 3, 2020. The parties are directed to call the court at (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 302 9857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1. Notice of Appearance of David Keyko, Jay D. Dealy and Stephanie Gomez, 2. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement 3. Pre-Motion Conference Letter to Judge Edgardo Ramos and 4. Certification of Service, on Plaintiff's counsel of record. served on Kevin J. Murtagh Ahmuty, Demers, & McMamanus, Attorneys for Defendant Legacy Chemical Corporation, Defendant VitalPure, LLC, Defendant Feel Well, LLC, Trustee SVB Financial Group, Trustee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on November 18, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Anvyl, Inc., Rodney Manzo..(Keyko, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) LETTER MOTION for Conference / Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Keyko dated November 18, 2020. Document filed by Anvyl, Inc., Rodney Manzo..(Keyko, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Anvyl, Inc...(Keyko, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Gomez on behalf of Anvyl, Inc., Rodney Manzo..(Gomez, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Durand Dealy on behalf of Anvyl, Inc., Rodney Manzo..(Dealy, James) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Keyko on behalf of Anvyl, Inc., Rodney Manzo..(Keyko, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rodney Manzo waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc...(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Anvyl, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc...(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan David Plaut. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1330; Dollar Demand $130,000,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan David Plaut to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc...(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Scott Bradley in Support re: #3 MOTION for Attachment to attach assets pending final adjudication .. Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Yoomi Corporate Deck, #2 Contract, #3 Purchase Order, #4 Wires, #5 E-mail from Anvyl, #6 Yellow bottles, #7 Admission letter).(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION for Attachment to attach assets pending final adjudication . . Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Attachment to attach assets pending final adjudication . Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc...(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Plaut, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21841554)Document filed by Yoomi Babytech, Inc...(Plaut, Jonathan) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SVB FINANCIAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant