This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 07:36:40 (UTC).

Yohn v. EEOC St. Louis Office et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Yohn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EEOC St Louis Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00433

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy D. Yohn

Defendants

Department of Health and Human Services

EEOC St. Louis Office

Judge Kendra Howard

Interested Parties

US Senator Kamala Harris

US Senator Claire McCaskill

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 19-2597 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Wendy D. Yohn. (Terry, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wendy D. Yohn. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number not paid. (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy of Judgment mailed with Order #3 . (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #2

Attachment to Complaint

#3

(#3) ORDER - DENYING #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 7/8/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Copy of Order mailed via first class mail to Wendy Yohn, C/O Kim Williams, 719 E. College, Independence, MO 64050. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wendy D. Yohn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#7

(#7) TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #6 Notice of Appeal. (Terry, Jason) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed. Mail sent to Wendy Yohn. (Related document(s) #3 , #4 ) (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Wendy D. Yohn. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #1

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 19-2597 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Wendy D. Yohn. (Terry, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #6 Notice of Appeal. (Terry, Jason) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wendy D. Yohn. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number not paid. (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed. Mail sent to Wendy Yohn. (Related document(s) #3 , #4 ) (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy of Judgment mailed with Order #3 . (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - DENYING #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 7/8/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Copy of Order mailed via first class mail to Wendy Yohn, C/O Kim Williams, 719 E. College, Independence, MO 64050. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Wendy D. Yohn. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wendy D. Yohn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.