This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 09:23:17 (UTC).

Dwight Yoakam v. Warner Music Group Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Dwight Yoakam filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Warner Music Group Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwight Yoakam

Defendants

Warner Records, Inc.

Warner Music Group Corp.

Rhino Entertainment Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Gerry Benjamin Hirschfeld

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Rollin A Ransom

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1010

Mitchell Santos Toledo

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Termination Notices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subsequent Termination Notices)(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam.(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Records, Inc., identifying Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rhino Entertainment Company answer now due 3/18/2021; Warner Records, Inc. answer now due 3/18/2021; Warner Music Group Corp. answer now due 3/18/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Rhino Entertainment Company; Warner Records, Inc.; Warner Music Group Corp..(Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Rhino Entertainment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Warner Music Group Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Warner Records, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam, upon Defendant Warner Records, Inc. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam, upon Defendant Warner Music Group Corp. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam, upon Defendant Rhino Entertainment Company served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Records, Inc. (et) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Dwight Yoakam. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam, (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 02/09/2021, receipt number ACACDC-30466034), filed by Plaintiff Dwight Yoakam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Termination Notices) (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Dwight Yoakam(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rhino Entertainment Company is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER RECORDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Steven Busch