This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

Betim Ymeri et al v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Betim Ymeri filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01491

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Naser Sahiti

Betim Ymeri

Burim Haliti

Defendants

AECOM

Brianna Collins

AC First LLC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Eric Feldman

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret

Attorney at Nelson and Fraenkel LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael P Doyle

Attorney at Doyle LLP

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77019

Jeffrey I Avery

Attorney at Doyle LLP

3401 Allen Pkwy Suite 100

Houston, TX 77019

Stuart R Fraenkel

Attorney at Nelson and Fraenkel LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Alan James Leiva Sims

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

633 West Fifth Street 63Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Helene J Wasserman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Kyle Anne Piasecki

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in Reply (Motion related) #27 . (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#27

(#27) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (and Strike Jury Demand) #20 filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#25

(#25) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri. (Avery, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#24

(#24) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #22 . (Sims, Alan) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey I Avery on behalf of Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri (Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Burim Haliti(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Naser Sahiti(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Betim Ymeri(pty:pla))(Avery, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM identifying Defendant AECOM is the parent corporation and is a publicly held corporation(NYSE: ACM). PRIMECAP Management Company owns more than 10% of AECOM stock. Defendant AC First LLC is wholly owned by Amentum Government Services, Inc., which is a privately-owned company that has no publicly-held parents. as Corporate Parent. (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM, identifying (1) Defendant AECOM (parent company); (2)PRIMECAP Management Company (owns more than 10% of AECOM stock); (3) Defendant AC First LLC (wholly owned by Amentum Government Services,Inc.; (4) Amentum Government Services, Inc. (privately-owned company that has no publicly-held parents); (5) Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America; (6) Defendant Eric Feldman; (7) Defendant Brianna Collins; (8) Plaintiff Betim Ymeri; (9) Plaintiff Naser Sahiti; (10 )Plaintiff Burim Haliti; (11) Nelson & Fraenkel LLP and (12) Doyle LLP. (Attorney Helene J Wasserman added to party AC First LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Helene J Wasserman added to party AECOM(pty:dft))(Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#6

(#6) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiffs BurimHaliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 set for April 19, 2021, is hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance will be necessary. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Hearing Dates of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Joint Ex Parte Application to Consolidate and Adjust Hearing Dates on Related Motions filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in Reply (Motion related) #27 . (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (and Strike Jury Demand) #20 filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (and Strike Jury Demand) #20 filed by Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Avery, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri. (Avery, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #22 . (Sims, Alan) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellie Downey, #2 Declaration of Lois Naftgzer)(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (and Strike Jury Demand) #20 filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM. (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey I Avery on behalf of Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti, Betim Ymeri (Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Burim Haliti(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Naser Sahiti(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey I Avery added to party Betim Ymeri(pty:pla))(Avery, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM identifying Defendant AECOM is the parent corporation and is a publicly held corporation(NYSE: ACM). PRIMECAP Management Company owns more than 10% of AECOM stock. Defendant AC First LLC is wholly owned by Amentum Government Services, Inc., which is a privately-owned company that has no publicly-held parents. as Corporate Parent. (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM, identifying (1) Defendant AECOM (parent company); (2)PRIMECAP Management Company (owns more than 10% of AECOM stock); (3) Defendant AC First LLC (wholly owned by Amentum Government Services,Inc.; (4) Amentum Government Services, Inc. (privately-owned company that has no publicly-held parents); (5) Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America; (6) Defendant Eric Feldman; (7) Defendant Brianna Collins; (8) Plaintiff Betim Ymeri; (9) Plaintiff Naser Sahiti; (10 )Plaintiff Burim Haliti; (11) Nelson & Fraenkel LLP and (12) Doyle LLP. (Attorney Helene J Wasserman added to party AC First LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Helene J Wasserman added to party AECOM(pty:dft))(Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINDER filed by Defendants AC First LLC, AECOM joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Wasserman, Helene) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Burim Haliti, Naser Sahiti and Betim Ymeri in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/8/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Brianna Collins, Eric Feldman, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV00806 Receipt No: ACACDC-30600393 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Eric Feldman, Brianna Collins, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Documents), #2 Exhibit B (Policy), #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Brianna Collins(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Eric Feldman(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AC First LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helene J Wasserman