This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 08:12:09 (UTC).

Yishra'el v. Wilson et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Yishra'el filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omar Qolayah Yishra'el

Mcdonald, TN 37353

Defendants

C Mullinix

Eric Diaz

Burlon Hayworth

David Myrick

Jamie Heath

Brian Desmond

Kevin Wilson

Eric Geren

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT re #10 Order: This case came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee's Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8]. For the reasons stated in the Court's Order adopting Judge Lee's Report and Recommendation, it is ORDERED AND ADJUGED that this action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Judgment mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #7 Motion to Seal Case; adopting Report and Recommendations re #8 Report and Recommendations. After careful consideration of the record as a whole and the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, and for the reasons set out in that Report and Recommendation which are incorporated by reference herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8] is ADOPTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Motion to Seal Case [Doc. 7] are DENIED AS MOOT, with no filing fee assessed. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

9 #1

Other Envelope

#9

(#9) OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/5/2019. (AML) Mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el (Entered: 11/05/2019)

7 #3

Other Envelope

7 #2

Other Affidavit of Recording

7 #1

Other Letter from State of Tennessee Treasury Department

#7

(#7) MOTION to Seal Case by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Letter from State of Tennessee Treasury Department, #2 Affidavit of Recording, #3 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el. (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el. (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Brian Desmond, Eric Diaz, Eric Geren, Burlon Hayworth, Jamie Heath, C Mullinix, David Myrick, Kevin Wilson, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el.(AML) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (AML) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT re #10 Order: This case came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee's Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8]. For the reasons stated in the Court's Order adopting Judge Lee's Report and Recommendation, it is ORDERED AND ADJUGED that this action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Judgment mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #7 Motion to Seal Case; adopting Report and Recommendations re #8 Report and Recommendations. After careful consideration of the record as a whole and the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, and for the reasons set out in that Report and Recommendation which are incorporated by reference herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8] is ADOPTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Motion to Seal Case [Doc. 7] are DENIED AS MOOT, with no filing fee assessed. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/5/2019. (AML) Mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Seal Case by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Letter from State of Tennessee Treasury Department, #2 Affidavit of Recording, #3 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el. (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el. (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Brian Desmond, Eric Diaz, Eric Geren, Burlon Hayworth, Jamie Heath, C Mullinix, David Myrick, Kevin Wilson, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el.(AML) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (AML) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.