This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2020 at 08:37:05 (UTC).

Yeske v. Worldmark, The Club et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Yeske filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Worldmark, The Club. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID L. YESKE

Defendants

WORLDMARK, THE CLUB

WYNDHAM RESORT DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J Manchee

Attorney at Manchee & Manchee, PC

2745 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 420

Plano, TX 75093

Defendant Attorney

Colleen Elizabeth McKnight

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP - Houston

2000 Wells Fargo Plaza, 1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDERED that the Parties' #5 Motion is granted, this case is dismissed with prejudice, and attorney's fees and costs of court be taxed against the party incurring the same. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/29/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by David L. Yeske. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manchee, James) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Worldmark, The Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

3 #1

Wyndham Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Worldmark, The Club & Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and emailed back to Attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Wyndham Summons)(ljw, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by DAVID L. YESKE PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Manchee, James) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #35

Exhibit Exhibit AH

1 #32

Exhibit Exhibit AE

1 #31

Exhibit Exhibit AD

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit M

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit L

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit K

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit F

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED that the Parties' #5 Motion is granted, this case is dismissed with prejudice, and attorney's fees and costs of court be taxed against the party incurring the same. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/29/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by David L. Yeske. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manchee, James) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wyndham Resort Development Corporation to 5/1/2020; Worldmark, The Club to 5/1/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, ) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Worldmark, The Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Worldmark, The Club & Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and emailed back to Attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Wyndham Summons)(ljw, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. District Judge Thad Heartfield no longer assigned to the case. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Notice of Judge Assignment - to be reassigned to Judge Truncale. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDISREGARD ENTRY, ASSIGNED IN ERROR Case assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (ljw, ) Modified on 3/3/2020 (ljw, ). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by David L. Yeske. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by DAVID L. YESKE PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Manchee, James) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against WORLDMARK, THE CLUB, WYNDHAM RESORT DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7688722.), filed by DAVID L. YESKE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit Exhibit AB, #30 Exhibit Exhibit AC, #31 Exhibit Exhibit AD, #32 Exhibit Exhibit AE, #33 Exhibit Exhibit AF, #34 Exhibit Exhibit AG, #35 Exhibit Exhibit AH, #36 Exhibit Exhibit AI, #37 Exhibit Exhibit AJ, #38 Exhibit Exhibit AK, #39 Exhibit Exhibit AL, #40 Exhibit Exhibit AM, #41 Exhibit Exhibit AN, #42 Exhibit Exhibit AO, #43 Exhibit Exhibit AP, #44 Exhibit Exhibit AQ)(Manchee, James) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worldmark, The Club is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Resort Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Justin Manchee