This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2019 at 07:04:04 (UTC).

Yesh Music, LLC v. Heartland Vineyard Church et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Yesh Music, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Heartland Vineyard Church. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Levy and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05016

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yesh Music, LLC

Defendants

Heartland Vineyard Church

Vineyard USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard M. Garbarini

Attorney at Garbarini FitzGerald P.C.

250 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10177

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Notice

1 #2

Exhibit Assignment

1 #1

Exhibit Registration

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i) plaintiff hereby serves notice that the above-captioned matter is dismissed against each defendant with prejudice. Each party is responsible for its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/10/2019. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yesh Music, LLC with Prejudice (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yesh Music, LLC with Prejudice (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/5/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Heartland Vineyard Church, Vineyard USA. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Heartland Vineyard Church filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11813720 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Vineyards is a litigant

Latest cases where Yesh Music, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Garbarini