This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2021 at 09:35:26 (UTC).

Yesh Music, LLC v. Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2021 Yesh Music, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches A3M. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Diane Gujarati. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Yesh Music, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Richard M. Garbarini

Attorney at Garbarini FitzGerald P.C.

250 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10177

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Verne Alan Pedro

Attorney at Fullerton Beck

331 Newman Spring Road, Bldg. 1, Suite #143, 07701

Red Bank, NJ 07701

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/16/2021 @ 11:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0002. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/26/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M) (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Yesh Music, LLC by Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M). (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

7 #2

copyright registration

7 #1

complaint

#7

(#7) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 copyright registration) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M). (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Notice

1 #2

Exhibit Notice

1 #1

Exhibit Registration and Assignment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M) filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13924190 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/16/2021 @ 11:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0002. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/26/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M) (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Yesh Music, LLC by Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M). (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 copyright registration) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M). (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Asians for Miracles Marrow Matches (A3M) filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13924190 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yesh Music, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Garbarini