This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:42:26 (UTC).

Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Yellow Rose Productions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Pandora Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00809

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Brave Lion, Inc.

Nick Di Paolo

Andrew Dice Clay

Robin Williams Trust

Ron White, Inc.

Main Sequence, LTD

Defendant

Pandora Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Fakler

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

John Nadolenco

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc., (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION (ECF No. #20 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court hereby orders that the stipulation is APPROVED. Defendant Pandora Media, LLC shall have until May 2, 2022 to respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. (lom) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#20) Joint STIPULATION to Clarify Court's March 22, 2022 Minute Order, Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,, #18 , filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fakler, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT related to: #1 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, filed by Plaintiffs Yellow Rose Productions, Inc., Ron White, Inc., Robin Williams Trust, Brave Lion, Inc., Main Sequence, LTD, Nick Di Paolo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Yellow Rose Properly Registered Literary Works, #2 Exhibit B - Main Sequence Properly Registered Literary Works, #3 Exhibit C - Ron White Inc. Properly Registered Literary Works, #4 Exhibit D - Robin Williams Trust Properly Registered Literary Works, #5 Exhibit E - Brave Lion Inc. Properly Registered Literary Works, #6 Exhibit F - Nick Di Paolo Properly Registered Literary Works)(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi:ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASESThe Court ordered the parties to show cause why it should not join thefollowing cases: Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809- MCS-MAR ; Main Sequence, LTDv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR ; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MA; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MAR. The plaintiffs to these actions responded that joinder under Rule 20(a)(1) was inappropriate and instead requested consolidation for all pretrial matters. See, e.g., Resp. to OSC, ECF No. 13, Yellow Rose Prods., No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR. The Court discharges the OSC and consolidates the cases for all pretrial matters/ For the same reasons as above, on its own motion the Court also consolidatesthese cases with the following case: Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-01345-MCS-MAR. The Court orders the following: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR, Main Sequence, LTD v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR, Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media,LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR, Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR, Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22- cv-00817-MCS-MAR, and Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv- 01345-MCS-MAR, are consolidated for pretrial purposes and should be captioned (3) Within seven days of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint in the master file. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be due under the timelines dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR REQUIRED CAPTION AS ORDERED HERE (2) The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR shall constitute the masterfile for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other actions. (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC and designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #16 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32863924) filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC identifying Sirius XM Radio Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pandora Media, LLC answer now due 4/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Pandora Media, LLC.(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pandora Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 [Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Joinder] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder)(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Pandora Media, LLC served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (lc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc., (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32745272 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Yellow Rose Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Steven Busch