This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:58:59 (UTC).

Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. v. AGI Publishing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Yellow Pages Photos, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against AGI Publishing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01754

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yellow Pages Photos, Inc.

Defendant

AGI Publishing, Inc. doing business as Valley Yellow Pages

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Edson Fee

Attorney at Fee & Jeffries PA

1227 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602-8002

Kathleen M. Wade

Attorney at Fee & Jeffries PA

1227 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602-8002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/3/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/3/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to AGI Publishing, Inc. (CRH) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Copyright Report sent to Washington. (CRH) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit Composite Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit Composite Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Composite Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AGI Publishing, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17120403) filed by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Composite Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Composite Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons)(Fee, Richard) Modified on 7/30/2020 (CRH). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice (Doc. #8), this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/25/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/3/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/3/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to AGI Publishing, Inc. (CRH) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Copyright Report sent to Washington. (CRH) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1754-T-33SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AGI Publishing, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17120403) filed by Yellow Pages Photos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Composite Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Composite Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons)(Fee, Richard) Modified on 7/30/2020 (CRH). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGI Publishing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Yellow Pages Photos, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Edson Fee