This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2020 at 07:26:30 (UTC).

Yeater v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/29/2019 Yeater filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald E. Bush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald E. Bush

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kateria Yeater

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael David Bybee

Attorney at Milodragovich, Dale & Steinbrenner, P.C.

Po Box 4947, 620 High Park Way

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Kevin S Kerr

Attorney at Schneider, Kerr & Robichaux

Po Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS - IT IS THEREFORE HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kevin S Kerr for Kateria Yeater Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS - IT IS THEREFORE HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kevin Kerr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1988396.)Michael David Bybee appearing for Petitioner Kateria Yeater. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Social Security Number by Kateria Yeater This is a sealed document.. (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Michael David Bybee appearing for Petitioner Kateria Yeater. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Kateria Yeater. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael David Bybee