This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 07:57:14 (UTC).

Steven Yearwood v. Open Systems Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Steven Yearwood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Open Systems Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02838

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Steven Yearwood

Monterey Park, CA 91755

Defendants and Petitioners

Open Systems Technologies, Inc.

Steven Yearwood

Monterey Park, CA 91755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Erika Lynn Shao

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sccully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elizabeth Mu

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS #12 . PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion, #12 , Notice of Withdrawal #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER. Other error(s) with document(s): No. 11 attempts to withdraw pending Motion to dismiss no. 7. However no proposed order was submitted, before filer attempted to file a new motion to dismiss no. 12, which was filed under incorrect event: Notice of Motion... However, incorrect event did not create a Pending Motion for ruling nor set it for hearing, instead only linked to no. 7 the Motion to be withdrawn...which remains as the only pending Motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

12 #2

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss

12 #1

Declaration of Elizabeth Y. Mu

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Y. Mu, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Shao, Erika) Modified on 4/3/2020 (lc). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#11

(#11) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Case #7 filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#10

(#10) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigants email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigants email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 5-3. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

3 #1

Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal to

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B to Declaration of Erika L. Shao

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS #12 . PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #12 , scheduled for June 1, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion, #12 , Notice of Withdrawal #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER. Other error(s) with document(s): No. 11 attempts to withdraw pending Motion to dismiss no. 7. However no proposed order was submitted, before filer attempted to file a new motion to dismiss no. 12, which was filed under incorrect event: Notice of Motion... However, incorrect event did not create a Pending Motion for ruling nor set it for hearing, instead only linked to no. 7 the Motion to be withdrawn...which remains as the only pending Motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Y. Mu, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Shao, Erika) Modified on 4/3/2020 (lc). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Case #7 filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigants email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigants email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 5-3. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc., filed by plaintiff Steven Yearwood. (filed in state court 12/26/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc., filed by plaintiff Steven Yearwood. (filed in state court 9/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV32395 Receipt No: ACACDC-25870660 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Open Systems Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika L. Shao, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Erika L. Shao, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Erika L. Shao, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Erika L. Shao, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Erika L. Shao) (Attorney Erika Lynn Shao added to party Open Systems Technologies, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Shao, Erika) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erika Lynn Shao