This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:52:52 (UTC).

Years v. Chambers Family Campground, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Years filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chambers Family Campground, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01386

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin Years

Kelly Years

Defendant

Chambers Family Campground, LLC d/b/a Potter County Family Campground

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin M. Blake

Attorney at Smith Mirabella Blake, LLC

100 N. 20Th Street, Suite 303

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Gregory A. Smith

Attorney at Smith Mirabella Blake

100 N. 20Th Street, Suite 303

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

Daniel D. Stofko

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

220 Penn Avenue, Suite 305

Scranton, PA 18503

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Statement

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/23/2020. (jr) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order approving #5 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the allegations of "recklessness" contained within the Plaintiffs' Complaint are hereby stricken, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/1/2020. (jr) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Chambers Family Campground, LLC. (Stofko, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Chambers Family Campground, LLC d/b/a Potter County Family Campground ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Chambers Family Campground, LLC.(Stofko, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of the parties re.allegations of recklessness by Chambers Family Campground, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stofko, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Stofko on behalf of Chambers Family Campground, LLC (Stofko, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/11/2020. (jr) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Gregory Smith (by way of email to Attorney Blake), along with instructions to register through Pacer as an e-filer. (lg) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Chambers Family Campground, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chambers Family Campground, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5195591), filed by Kevin Years, Kelly Years. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement)(nr) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGORY A. SMITH(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEVIN M. BLAKE