Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 07:18:19 (UTC).

Ybarra v. The Bank of Missouri et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Ybarra filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against The Bank of Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Daniel D. Crabtree. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02644

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanna R. Ybarra

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

The Bank of Missouri

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan J. Stecklein

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Matthew S. Robertson

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Michael H. Rapp

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Defendant Attorneys

Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Kate Bohon McKinney

Attorney at Martin Pringle Oliver Wallace & Bauer, LLP - Overland Park

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Building 40, Suite 1150

Overland Park, KS 66210

Benjamin Scott Tschudy

Attorney at Martin Pringle Oliver Wallace & Bauer, LLP - Overland Park

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Building 40, Suite 1150

Overland Park, KS 66210

Andrea S. McMurtry

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Danne Wayne Webb

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Eric A. Nicholson

Attorney at Jones Day - Detroit

150 West Jefferson Street, Suite 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Bryan E. Mouber

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - OP

51 Corporate Woods, 9393 W. 110Th Street, Suite 500

Overland Park, KS 66210

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant The Bank of Missouri (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Tschudy, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

14 #2

ECF Registration Form

14 #1

Affidavit

#14

(#14) MOTION for attorney Eric A. Nicholson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5004378.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of Missouri identifying Reliable Community Bancshares, Inc. as corporate parent . (McKinney, Kate) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant The Bank of Missouri (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons)(McKinney, Kate) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian PLC as corporate parent . (Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent . (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Joanna R. Ybarra. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, KS, case number 2019-LM-004068 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4954486.), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #16 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Deadline extended to December 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant The Bank of Missouri (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Tschudy, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Eric A. Nicholson as counsel for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for attorney Eric A. Nicholson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5004378.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Response shall be filed on or before December 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/14/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of Missouri identifying Reliable Community Bancshares, Inc. as corporate parent . (McKinney, Kate) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant The Bank of Missouri (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons)(McKinney, Kate) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian PLC as corporate parent . (Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent . (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Joanna R. Ybarra. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, KS, case number 2019-LM-004068 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4954486.), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mouber, Bryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant