This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2020 at 08:33:42 (UTC).

Ybarra v. Circle K Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Ybarra filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Circle K Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00508

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Nicol Alicia Ybarra

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendants

Circle K Corporation

Glendale Police Department

VSS Security Guard Service

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed March 31, 2020, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (MSA) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the #1 Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as frivolous and for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant, against Plaintiff, and to terminate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is denied as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/31/2020. (MSA) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#3

(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00508-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicol Alicia Ybarra. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nicol Alicia Ybarra.(BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed March 31, 2020, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (MSA) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the #1 Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as frivolous and for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant, against Plaintiff, and to terminate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is denied as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/31/2020. (MSA) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00508-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicol Alicia Ybarra. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nicol Alicia Ybarra.(BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant