This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 08:52:16 (UTC).

Yawer v. Cornerstone Home Lending Inc

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Yawer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01593

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hassan Yawer

Aurora, CO 80019

Defendants

Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.

Cornerstone Home Lending Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K. Glenn

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP-Denver

1801 Wewatta, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Jamie H. Steiner

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP-Denver

1801 Wewatta, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit A to Cornerstone's Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion for J

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Exhibit A to Cornerstone's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss

17 #17

Main Document

#16

#15

#14

#11

#13

#12

#10

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-Docket from State Court

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Order to for Judgment (Second Motion) filed by Defendant Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cornerstone's Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Judgment)(Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cornerstone's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Order to [Enter] Judgment filed by Defendant Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. (Steiner, Jamie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/08/2021, re: #11 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (alave, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 by Defendant Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. (Steiner, Jamie) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/25/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall show cause, in writing, by July 7,2021, as to why removal was proper, i.e., why the Court should construe Plaintiff's claims as stating a claim that gives rise to original jurisdiction of this Court. If Defendant does not respond or explain why the Court has jurisdiction over this case, the case will be remanded to the Arapahoe County District Court. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Judgment by Plaintiff Hassan Yawer. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Hassan Yawer. Only Plaintiff Consents. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Cornerstone Home Lending Inc. (Steiner, Jamie) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of Summons and Petition upon Patrick Mathis on 05/21/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#6) District Court COMPLAINT - Civil against Cornerstone Home Lending Inc, filed by Hassan Yawer.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamie H. Steiner on behalf of Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.Attorney Jamie H. Steiner added to party Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.(pty:dft) (Steiner, Jamie) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. for Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.. (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV000122. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7911316), filed by Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket from State Court, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit State Court Return of Service)(Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Kenton Glenn(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie H. Steiner