This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2020 at 07:04:10 (UTC).

Yassine v. Universal Recovery Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Yassine filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Universal Recovery Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02945

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy M. Yassine

Defendant

Universal Recovery Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Michal Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group, APC

6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence Keith Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group, LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Mark Ewell Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group, LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Recovery Corporation (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/11/2020) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#11

(#11) Universal Recovery Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUniversal Recovery Corporation. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/11/2020) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy M. Yassine. Universal Recovery Corporation served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/14/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randy M. Yassine.. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Universal Recovery Corporation. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Universal Recovery Corporation (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14421806). Filed by Randy M. Yassine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Recovery Corporation (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/11/2020) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Universal Recovery Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUniversal Recovery Corporation. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/11/2020) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy M. Yassine. Universal Recovery Corporation served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/14/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randy M. Yassine.. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Universal Recovery Corporation. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Universal Recovery Corporation (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14421806). Filed by Randy M. Yassine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Recovery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Iglesias