This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 13:42:26 (UTC).

Yasmin Mohamed v. Republic Records, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Yasmin Mohamed filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Republic Records, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Yasmin Mohamed

Yasminah

Respondents and Defendants

XO Records, LLC

Does 1-10

Jason Quenneville

Thomas Bangalter

Martin McKinney

Universal Music Group

Squad Music Group

Republic Records

Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo

Henry Walter

William Uschold

Tyrone Dangerfield

Abel Makkonen Tesfaye

UMG Recordings, Inc.

The Weeknd XO, LLC

Cirkut

Daft Punk

Doc

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Alexa Danchuk

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

2 Victoria Lane

Falmouth, ME 04105

Kris S LeFan

Attorney at LeFan Law PC

1925 Century Park East Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven T Lowe

Attorney at Lowe and Associates APC

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott Alan Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Law Firm

300 Corporate Pointe, Suite 355

Culver City, CA 90230

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Anderson

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sandra A Crawshaw-Sparks

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marcia Beth Paul

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (NYC)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Amanda Brooke Levine

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Sandra Allison Crawshaw

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP (NYC)

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#96

#95

#94

#93

#92

91 #1

Proposed Order

#91

#90

#88

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. upon Thomas Bangalter waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2019, answer due 5/21/2019; Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Peter Button, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) 21 DAYS Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #93 as to Defendants Thomas Bangalter, Martin McKinney, Jason Quenneville, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Group, Henry Walter, Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo. (jp) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #93 filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Thomas Bangalter, Does 1-10, Martin McKinney, Jason Quenneville, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Henry Walter, Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo amending Complaint - (Discovery), #5 , filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ORDER STRIKING PREVIOUSLY FILED FAC (Doc. 88) #91 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Plaintiff be and is hereby granted leave to file the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve the FAC in conformity with Local Rules 15-1 to 15-3. The Court hereby STRIKES the previously filed FAC (Doc. #88 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Appearing Defendants shall respond to the First Amended Complaint within 21 days of the entry of this Order. (jp) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) STIPULATION for Leave to Allow the Filing of a First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #88 as to defendants Thomas Bangalter, Martin McKinney, Yasmin Mohamed, Jason Quenneville, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Henry Walter, Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #88 filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) **STRICKEN, PER ORDER #92 *** FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Thomas Bangalter, Does 1-10, Martin McKinney, Jason Quenneville, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, Universal Music Group, Henry Walter, Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo, The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #5 , filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed(Burroughs, Scott). Modified on 2/19/2019 (jp). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven T Lowe counsel for Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. Adding Steven T. Lowe as counsel of record for Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Yasmin Mohamed. (Attorney Steven T Lowe added to party Yasmin Mohamed(pty:pla))(Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Emily Alexa Danchuk. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Republic Records; Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo; Thomas Bangalter; Jason Quenneville; William Uschold; Tyrone Dangerfield; Abel Makkonen Tesfaye; Martin McKinney; Henry Walter. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Emily Alexa Danchuk. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5000000000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5000000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Emily Alexa Danchuk to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand Code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Emily Alexa Danchuk to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Universal Music Group and Does 1-10; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yasmin Mohamed.(Danchuk, Emily) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Danchuk, Emily) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Danchuk, Emily) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Thomas Bangalter, Tyrone Dangerfield, Martin McKinney, Jason Quenneville, Republic Records, Inc., Squad Music Group, William Uschold, Henry Walter, XO Records, LLC, Guillaume Emmanuel de Homem-Christo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15581852)Document filed by Yasmin Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Danchuk, Emily) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.O.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant