This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:24:30 (UTC).

Yarbrough v. Santa Fe Independent School District et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Yarbrough filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Santa Fe Independent School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Yarbrough

Defendants

Marie Griffin

Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities

Raymond Buse

Matthew Bentley

Richard Davis

Jess Golightly

Taylor Wulf

Santa Fe Independent School District

Dr. Leigh Wall

Christopher Cavness

Mark Kanipes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Alfred Southerland

Attorney at Southerland Law Firm

4141 Southwest Freeway, Ste 300

Houston, TX 77027

Lewis Matthews Chandler

Attorney at The Chandler Law Firm, L.L.P.

540 Heights Blvd, Ste 360

Houston, TX 77007

Sherry Scott Chandler

Attorney at The Chandler Law Firm LLP

4141 Sw Fwy, Ste 300

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

Clay T Grover

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP

5718 Westheimer, Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

23 #2

Proposed Order

23 #1

Appendix

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss #21 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Matthew Bentley, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Grover, Clay) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#21

(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf filed by Chase Yarbrough.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 11/26/2020)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf, filed.(Grover, Clay) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marie Griffin served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Chandler, Sherry) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chase Yarbrough served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Chandler, Sherry) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christopher Cavness served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raymond Buse served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew Bentley served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION of Sherry Chandler as attorney in charge of Chase Yarbrough, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION of Sherry Chandler as attorney in charge of Chase Yarbrough, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25361818) filed by Chase Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss #21 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Matthew Bentley, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Grover, Clay) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf filed by Chase Yarbrough.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 11/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities, Raymond Buse, Christopher Cavness, Richard Davis, Jess Golightly, Marie Griffin, Mark Kanipes, Santa Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Taylor Wulf, filed.(Grover, Clay) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marie Griffin served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Chandler, Sherry) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chase Yarbrough served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Chandler, Sherry) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chase Yarbrough, filed.(Chandler, Sherry) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jess Golightly served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to Marie Griffin. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark Kanipes served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard Davis served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christopher Cavness served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raymond Buse served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and their successors in office in their official capacities served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew Bentley served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION of Sherry Chandler as attorney in charge of Chase Yarbrough, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION of Sherry Chandler as attorney in charge of Chase Yarbrough, filed.(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25361818) filed by Chase Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Southerland, James) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Fe Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant