This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 11:12:37 (UTC).

Yanoski v. Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Yanoski filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00414

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Yanoski

Defendants

Michael Newsome

Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania

Brian T. Lyman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle RA Susanj

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren M. Hoye

Attorney at Willig, Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Scott A Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

P. Casey Pitts

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Yanoski. Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Susanj, Danielle) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Donna Yanoski. Brian T. Lyman waiver sent on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021; Michael Newsome waiver sent on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Susanj, Danielle) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (ve) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/29/21 (ve) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to complaint by Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to P. Casey Pitts, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/26/2021. (ve) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott A. Kronland, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/26/2021. (ve) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for petitioner and associate counsel, as to documents #4 & #5 . (rw) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott A Kronland on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania Attorney Scott Kronland is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5524767.. (Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by P. Casey Pitts on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania Attorney P. Casey Pitts is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5524763.. (Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Hoye on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Pennsylvania (Hoye, Lauren) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5504129), filed by Donna Yanoski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Hoye Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick C. Pitts Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Kronland