This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 10:22:32 (UTC).

Yang v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Yang filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank, David T. Schultz, Katherine M. Menendez and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donovan W. Frank

Susan Richard Nelson

Referral Judges

David T. Schultz

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Felicia Yang

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darren B. Schwiebert

Attorney at DBS Law LLC

301 Fourth Avenue South, Suite 280N

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Felicia Yang re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Felicia Yang. (MKB) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/23/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that case 20-cv-1397 (DWF/DTS) has been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Donovan W. Frank, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1397 (SRN/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/18/2020.(MMP) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed by Felicia Yang. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schwiebert, Darren) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Felicia Yang re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Felicia Yang. (MKB) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/23/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that case 20-cv-1397 (DWF/DTS) has been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Donovan W. Frank, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1397 (SRN/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/18/2020.(MMP) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1397 (DWF/DTS). (MMP) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Felicia Yang. (Schwiebert, Darren) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed by Felicia Yang. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schwiebert, Darren) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less