This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 05:45:52 (UTC).

Yang v. Maxim Media Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Yang filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Maxim Media Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03097

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Yang

Defendant

Maxim Media Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Freeman

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 5Th Floor

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Original Photographs

1 #2

Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photographs

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maxim Media Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maxim Media Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#7

(#7) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Maxim Media Inc. served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Clerk. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#10

(#10) DECLARATION of James H. Freeman in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to MAXIM MEDIA INC. (tp) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to MAXIM MEDIA INC. (tp) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of James H. Freeman in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Maxim Media Inc. served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Clerk. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maxim Media Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Stephen Yang..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maxim Media Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Yang..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Maxim Media Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26008727)Document filed by Stephen Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photographs, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photographs).(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig B. Sanders

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H. Freeman Esq.