This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2020 at 12:00:27 (UTC).

Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. v. JAC Shipping, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against JAC Shipping, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01118

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.

Defendants

JAC Shipping, Inc.

Jensen Lee

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Andrew Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

One Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant JAC Shipping, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant JAC Shipping, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

6 #1

Declaration of Mark A. Beckman in Support of Entry of Default of JAC Shipping, I

#6

(#6) Request for Certificate of Default by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Beckman in Support of Entry of Default of JAC Shipping, Inc. with Exhibit A) (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. JAC Shipping, Inc. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

2 #1

Jensen summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JAC Shipping, Inc., Jensen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Jensen summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JAC Shipping, Inc., Jensen Lee filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12464037 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant JAC Shipping, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant JAC Shipping, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Certificate of Default by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Beckman in Support of Entry of Default of JAC Shipping, Inc. with Exhibit A) (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. JAC Shipping, Inc. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to JAC Shipping, Inc., Jensen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Jensen summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JAC Shipping, Inc., Jensen Lee filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12464037 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman