This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 12:22:19 (UTC).

Yang et al v. Messer et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Yang filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Messer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05964

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Appellants

Selena Chau

Tu Kang Yang

Appellees

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

41-31 Haight Street Lender LLC

Gregory Messer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Eric J. Snyder

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street, New York

New York, NY 10281

Appellee Attorneys

Scott James Bogucki

Attorney at Baumeister Denz LLP

174 Franklin Street, Suite 2

Buffalo, NY 14202

Steven H. Newman

Attorney at Katsky Korins LLP

605 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10158

Gary F. Herbst

Attorney at Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

3305 Jerusalem Avenue

Wantagh, NY 11793

Jacqulyn Somers Loftin

Attorney at Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

3305 Jerusalem Avenue, Ste. 201

Wantagh, NY 11793

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

369 Transmittal

1 #2

357 Motion to Authorize

1 #3

386 Deficiency Notice

1 #4

367 Notice to Parties

#2

#3

3 #1

Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK

3 #2

Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK: Notice Recipients

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter advising the District Court that the Settlement between the Parties was approved by the Bankruptcy Court subject to entry of the Stipulation and Order by Gregory Messer (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK, #2 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK: Notice Recipients) (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER: The Appellee's letter application #2 with the consent of the Appellant's is GRANTED. This case is stayed, because counsel report that it has been settled. By January 25, 2021 the Appellee shall file either a stipulation withdrawing this appeal or a status report letter as to the proceeding in the Bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/21/2020. (Innelli, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Appellants' Designation of Record and Other Deadlines While the Bankruptcy Court Considers the Proposed Settlement by Gregory Messer. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-43441., filed by Tu Kang Yang, Selena Chau. (Attachments: #1 369 Transmittal, #2 357 Motion to Authorize, #3 386 Deficiency Notice, #4 367 Notice to Parties) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Jay Snyder