This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2020 at 11:19:04 (UTC).

YANCEY v. WALMART et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 YANCEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-09168

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYNNE YANCEY

Defendants

ABC CORP.

JOHN DOE

WALMART

arbtre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAURA A. RABB

Attorney at RABB HAMILL, PA.A

284 Amboy Avenue, Route 35 North

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

JOHN J. KANE

Attorney at MARTIN, KANE & KUPER, ESQS.

180 Tices Lane, Building B, Suite 200

East Brunswick, NJ 08816

Defendant Attorney

NADA MAALOUF PETERS

Attorney at d'ARCAMBAL OUSLEY & CUYLER BURK, LLP

Four Century Drive

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LAURA A. RABB terminated.. (KANE, JOHN) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/28/2020. (if, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

3 #1

Certification of Service

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART. (PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

1 #4

Certification of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-002797-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11100313), filed by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LAURA A. RABB terminated.. (KANE, JOHN) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/28/2020. (if, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (abr) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART. (PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-002797-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11100313), filed by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less