This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 08:45:56 (UTC).

YANCEY v. ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 YANCEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Evans Barker and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02678

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURI YANCEY

Defendant

Ascension Health Alliance, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Annavieve C. Conklin

Attorney at DELANEY & DELANEY LLC

3646 N. Washington Blvd.

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Kathleen Ann DeLaney

Attorney at DELANEY & DELANEY LLC

3646 North Washington Blvd.

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Defendant Attorneys

Alan L. McLaughlin

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Ryan Joseph Sterling

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (LMK) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by LAURI YANCEY. ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC. served on 10/20/2021. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. McLaughlin on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Joseph Sterling on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (Sterling, Ryan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/14/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#12

(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC..(Sterling, Ryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC..(Sterling, Ryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/14/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Joseph Sterling on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (Sterling, Ryan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. McLaughlin on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by LAURI YANCEY. ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC. served on 10/20/2021. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, INC.. (LMK) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Annavieve C. Conklin on behalf of Plaintiff LAURI YANCEY. (Conklin, Annavieve) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff LAURI YANCEY. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Ascension Health Alliance, Inc., filed by LAURI YANCEY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6797816) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ascension Health Alliance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan L. McLaughlin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Joseph Sterling