This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 08:48:06 (UTC).

Yanas et al v. Pagourtzis et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Yanas filed an Other lawsuit against Pagourtzis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00141

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shirley Beazley

Galveston, TX 77550

Rosie Yanas

Houston, TX 77546

William ("Billy") Beazley

Galveston, TX 77550

Christopher Stone

Houston, TX 77546

Defendants

Dustin Gross

Houston, TX 77056

Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC

Rose Marie Kosmetatos

League City, TX 77573

Mollenhour Gross, LLC

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000, Attn: Andy Landry

Houston, TX 77056

Lucky Gunner, LLC

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Antonios Pagourtzis

League City, TX 77573

Jordan Mollenhour

Houston, TX 77056

Intervenors

Farah Aziz

Houston, TX 77546

Clayton Horn

Houston, TX 77546

Shannan Claussen

Houston, TX 77546

Gail McLeod

Houston, TX 77546

Rhonda Hart

Friendswood, TX 77546

Mark McLeod

Houston, TX 77546

Flo Rice

Houston, TX 77546

Pamela Stanich

Houston, TX 77546

Farah Naz

Houston, TX 77546

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

Darrell A Apffel

Attorney at Bettison Doyle et al

6710 Stewart Rd, Ste 300

Galveston, TX 77551

Clint E McGuire

Attorney at Martinez & McGuire PLLC

17227 Mercury Drive, Suite B

Houston, TX 77058

Alton C Todd

Attorney at The Law Firm of Alton C Tood

312 S Friendswood Dr

Friendswood, TX 77546

Krystan Hitchock

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Molly Thomas Jensen

Attorney at Everytown Law

P.O. Box # 4184, 450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Alla Lefkowitz

Attorney at Everytown Law

P.O. Box #4184, 450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Andre M Landry, III

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Andrew A Lothson

Attorney at Swanson Martin & Bell

330 North Wabash Ave, Ste 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Brian Brian Vogts

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP

Suite 3300, 330North Wabash

Chicago, IL 60611

Ronald Joseph Rodgers

Attorney at Rodgers Law Group, PLLC

3027 Marina Bay Dr., Ste 230

League City, TX 77573

Kristie Widner Tobin

Attorney at Holman Fenwick Willan USA LLP

5151 San Felipe, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

#23

20 #2

Proposed Order

20 #1

Exhibit

#20

#19

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E (Index)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D (Parties List)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C (Online Docket Report)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2 of 2 (B41-B82(

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1 of 2 (B1-B40)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A (A1-A15)

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 MOTION to Remand, filed by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC. (Landry, Andre) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Extended Briefing by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Molly Thomas-Jensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Krystan Hitchcock to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Remand by Abdul Aziz, Shirley Beazley, William ("Billy") Beazley, Shannan Claussen, Rhonda Hart, Clayton Horn, Gail McLeod, Mark McLeod, Farah Naz, Flo Rice, Pamela Stanich, Christopher Stone, Rosie Yanas, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(McGuire, Clint) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Molly Thomas-Jensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abdul Aziz, Farah Naz, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (McGuire, Clint) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Krystan Hitchcock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abdul Aziz, Farah Naz, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (McGuire, Clint) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abdul Aziz, Farah Naz, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (McGuire, Clint) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties)(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Andrew A. Lothson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2020. (Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for James Brian Vogts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2020. (Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED #4 MOTION by Lucky Gunner, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Dustin Gross, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jordan Mollenhour Declaration, #2 Exhibit Dustin Gross Declaration, #3 Exhibit J.M. on Behalf of Mollenhour Gross)(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McCollom Declaration)(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Lucky Gunner, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, filed.(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24613419) filed by Dustin Gross, Lucky Gunner, LLC, Red Stag Fulfillment, LLC, Jordan Mollenhour, Mollenhour Gross, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (A1-A15), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1 of 2 (B1-B40), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2 of 2 (B41-B82(, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C (Online Docket Report), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D (Parties List), #6 Exhibit Exhibit E (Index), #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Landry, Andre) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alla Lefkowitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clint McGuire