This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2019 at 07:02:06 (UTC).

Yamido et al v. Flying Food Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Yamido filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Flying Food Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elias Yamido

Mark Sibayan

Thelma Yamido

Defendant

Flying Food Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernesto Sanchez

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Un Kei Wu

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Arlo Garcia Uriarte

Attorney at Liberation Law Group

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Daniel P. Iannitelli

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Jonathan S. Rebong

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant Attorneys

John Allan Conkle

Attorney at Conkle Kremer Engel PLC

3130 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Desiree J. Ho

Attorney at Conkle, Kremer & Engel, PLC

3130 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 500

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Amanda Rose Washton

Attorney at Conkle, Kremer & Engel PLC

3130 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 500

Santa Monica, CA 90403

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFlying Food Group, LLC. (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/25/2019) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to re view General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flying Food Group, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flying Food Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Flying Food Fare, Inc. for Flying Food Group, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Flying Food Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Flying Food Fare, Inc. for Flying Food Group, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Declaration of Laura Bland

1 #3

Exhibit B to Dec of John A. Conkle

1 #2

Exhibit A to Dec of John A. Conkle

1 #1

Declaration of John A. Conkle

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CIV06696. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13018954). Filed by Flying Food Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John A. Conkle, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John A. Conkle, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of John A. Conkle, #4 Declaration of Laura Bland, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFlying Food Group, LLC. (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/25/2019) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to re view General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flying Food Group, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flying Food Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Flying Food Fare, Inc. for Flying Food Group, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Flying Food Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Flying Food Fare, Inc. for Flying Food Group, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CIV06696. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13018954). Filed by Flying Food Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John A. Conkle, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John A. Conkle, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of John A. Conkle, #4 Declaration of Laura Bland, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Conkle, John) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less