This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 11:05:32 (UTC).

Yacup v. Illinois State Police

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Yacup filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Illinois State Police. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03060

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Yacup

Defendant

Illinois State Police

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P Baker

Attorney at BAKER BAKER & KRAJEWSKI LLC

415 S Seventh St

Springfield, IL 62701

Defendant Attorney

Scott Byron Sievers

Attorney at ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

500 S Second St

Springfield, IL 62701

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Defendant Illinois State Police. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer), #1 Complaint by Defendant Illinois State Police. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Scott Byron Sievers on behalf of Illinois State Police (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by James Yacup. (Baker, James) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Of James Yacup against Illinois State Police ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3602491.), filed by James Yacup. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, James) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #7 is ALLOWED. Defendant is given until 5/2/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 4/23/2021. (GL) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Defendant Illinois State Police. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #6 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 4/22/2021. (LB) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer), #1 Complaint by Defendant Illinois State Police. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Scott Byron Sievers on behalf of Illinois State Police (Sievers, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Yacup. Illinois State Police served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Baker, James) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by James Yacup. (Baker, James) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Illinois State Police. Original returned to Attorney James Baker to effectuate service. (GL) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Of James Yacup against Illinois State Police ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3602491.), filed by James Yacup. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, James) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Byron Sievers