This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:23:44 (UTC).

Xylon Licensing LLC v. PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Xylon Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xylon Licensing LLC

Defendant

PlainsCapital Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #4

Summons

10 #3

Summons

10 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

10 #1

Exhibit A-US8719165

#10

#9

8 #1

Appendix

#8

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

#6

#5

#4

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant Motion to Allow Jamison Joiner (Mr. Joiner) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Joiner is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Joiner has withdrawn as counsel for Defendant and that he no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jamison M. Joiner by PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Neerman, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xylon Licensing LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Hilltop Holdings, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to PlainsCapital Bank. (bw) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PlainsCapital Bank, Hilltop Holdings, Inc. amending, filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8719165, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION. (Joiner, Jamison) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Brief in Support by PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Joiner, Jamison) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Xylon Licensing LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14667634) by on behalf of Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to PLAINSCAPITAL CORPORATION. (bw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14641508), filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less