This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:23:52 (UTC).

Xylon Licensing LLC v. Lone Star National Bancshares-Texas, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Xylon Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lone Star National Bancshares-Texas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xylon Licensing LLC

Defendant

Lone Star National Bancshares-Texas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

Aegis Tower - Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14667635) by on behalf of Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Lone Star National Bancshares-Texas, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14641568), filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Xylon Licensing LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14667635) by on behalf of Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Lone Star National Bancshares-Texas, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14641568), filed by Xylon Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less