This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:29:38 (UTC).

Xueshan Technologies Inc. v. Renesas Electronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Xueshan Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xueshan Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Renesas Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Nathan Louis Levenson

Ryan P Griffin

Edward R Nelson, III

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc. for Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Louis Levenson on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Levenson, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Renesas Electronics, Inc. answer due 8/16/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Renesas Electronics, Inc. answer due 8/16/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Louis Levenson on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Levenson, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc. for Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement against Renesas Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8926321.), filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less