2:22-CV-00157
05/17/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Rodney Gilstrap
Roy S. Payne
Xueshan Technologies Inc.
Renesas Electronics, Inc.
Jonathan Hart Rastegar
Nathan Louis Levenson
Ryan P Griffin
Edward R Nelson, III
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc. for Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Louis Levenson on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Levenson, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Main Document
Text of Proposed Order
(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Renesas Electronics, Inc. answer due 8/16/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Renesas Electronics, Inc. answer due 8/16/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Louis Levenson on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Levenson, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc. for Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement against Renesas Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8926321.), filed by Xueshan Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
[-] Read Less