This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2023 at 09:21:13 (UTC).

Xueshan Technologies, Inc. v. Renesas Electronics Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 Xueshan Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xueshan Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Renesas Electronics Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan P Griffin

David Thomas DeZern

Jinming Zhang

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Edward R Nelson, III

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Renesas Electronics Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9386518.), filed by Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WI-LAN Inc., Corporate Parent Quarterhill Inc., Corporate Parent Wi-LAN Technologies Inc. for Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Thomas DeZern on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (DeZern, David) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jinming Zhang on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9394612. (Zhang, Jinming) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/23/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Renesas Electronics Corporation (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/09/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Renesas Electronics Corporation (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Renesas Electronics Corporation to 8/1/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/23/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jinming Zhang on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9394612. (Zhang, Jinming) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Thomas DeZern on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (DeZern, David) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Xueshan Technologies, Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Renesas Electronics Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xueshan Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WI-LAN Inc., Corporate Parent Quarterhill Inc., Corporate Parent Wi-LAN Technologies Inc. for Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Renesas Electronics Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9386518.), filed by Xueshan Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less