This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2020 at 09:32:06 (UTC).

XTO Energy Inc v. Frontier Drilling, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 XTO Energy Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frontier Drilling, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Reed C. O'Connor and Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00775

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Reed C. O'Connor

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XTO Energy Inc

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Rigup, Inc

Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.

Rusco Operating, LLC

Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc.

Cody Kirkpatrick

Frontier Drilling, LLC

Great Northern Insurance Company

Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Frontier Drilling, LLC

Great Northern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew D Sims

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

777 Main St, Suite 1800

Fort Worth, TX 76102-5341

Caroline Marie Cyrier

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

777 Main Street, Suite 1800

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Michael Hupf

Attorney at Brackett & Ellis, P.C.

100 Main Street, Suite 400

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jeffrey Bentch

Attorney at Hall Maines Lugrin PC

2800 Post Oak Blvd. Ste. 6400

Houston, TX 77056

Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar

Attorney at Wright Close & Barger LLP

1 Riverway, Suite 2200

Houston, TX 77057

Michael Alan Orlando, Jr

Attorney at Meyer Orlando LLC

13201 Northwest Freeway, Suite 119

Houston, TX 77040

Peter Joseph Bambace

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

2900 Weslayan, Suite 610

Houston, TX 77027

Kayla Chudej Miller

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

2900 Weslayan, Suite 610

Houston, TX 77027

Charles B Holm

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

1010 Lamar, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Gregory Richardson Ave

Attorney at Walters Balido & Crain LLP

10440 North Central Expy, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Peter Joseph Bambace

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

2900 Weslayan, Suite 610

Houston, TX 77027

Kayla Chudej Miller

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

2900 Weslayan, Suite 610

Houston, TX 77027

Charles B Holm

Attorney at Holm Bambace LLP

1010 Lamar, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Gregory Richardson Ave

Attorney at Walters Balido & Crain LLP

10440 North Central Expy, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

31 #2

Exhibit(s) B

31 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#31

#30

#29

#28

27 #1

Exhibit(s)

#27

#25

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Appendix in Support filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re #30 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re #29 Response/Objection (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Hupf on behalf of Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Rigup, Inc, Rusco Operating, LLC, Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hupf, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Appendix in Support filed by XTO Energy Inc re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #26 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Sims, Andrew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by XTO Energy Inc re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Sims, Andrew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by XTO Energy Inc (Sims, Andrew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Kayla Chudej Miller added to party Frontier Drilling, LLC(pty:crd) (Miller, Kayla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Kayla Chudej Miller added to party Frontier Drilling, LLC(pty:crd) (Miller, Kayla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER..Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer (the Scheduling Conference) in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable.Joint Report due by 8/13/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/30/2020) (wrb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rusco Operating, LLC, Rigup, Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., First CROSSCLAIM against Frontier Drilling, LLC, Great Northern Insurance Company filed by Rusco Operating, LLC, Rigup, IncAttorney Jeffrey Bentch added to party Rigup, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Bentch added to party Rusco Operating, LLC(pty:dft) (Bentch, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC. (Orlando, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC, Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., CROSSCLAIM against Frontier Drilling, LLC, Great Northern Insurance Company filed by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC, Johnny Noel Macon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Cody Kirkpatrick(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC(pty:dft) (Orlando, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jul 27 08:09:45 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C. O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Mark Pittman for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:20-cv-775-P. (bdb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11023795) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Ave, Gregory) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUSCO OPERATING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rigup, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where XTO Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Northern Insurance Company is a litigant