This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 10:22:24 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netgear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01064

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

XR Communications, LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendant

Netgear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James N Pickens

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: SA CV 21-01064-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case SA CV 21-01064-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17-596 DOC(JDEx). Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596-DOC-JDEx. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dta) Modified on 6/24/2021 The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01064-DOC-JDEx. Signed by Judge David O. Carter(dta). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Michael R. Wilner. New Case Number 2:21-cv-4942 GW (MRWx). (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Related Case(s). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Netgear, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: SA CV 21-01064-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case SA CV 21-01064-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17-596 DOC(JDEx). Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596-DOC-JDEx. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dta) Modified on 6/24/2021 The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01064-DOC-JDEx. Signed by Judge David O. Carter(dta). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Michael R. Wilner. New Case Number 2:21-cv-4942 GW (MRWx). (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Related Case(s). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Netgear, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481508 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Netgear, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle