This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 11:23:17 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. D-Link Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against D-Link Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01063

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

XR Communications, LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendant

D-Link Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James N Pickens

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: SA CV 21-01063-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case SA CV 21-01063-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17- 596 DOC(JDEx). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#19

(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, upon Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marilyn Pham, Executive Assistant served under F.R.C.P. Rule 4. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596-DOC-JDEx. Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dta) The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01063-DOC-JDEx. Signed by Judge David O. Carter Modified on 6/24/2021 (dta). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. Amended Notice of Related Cases Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-596; 8:17-cv-00674; 2:17-cv- 02945; 2:17-cv- 02948; 2:17-cv-02951; 2:17-cv- 02953; 2:17-cv-02959; 2:17-cv- 02968; 2:21-cv-04912; 2:21-cv-04914; 2:21-cv-04942; 8:21-cv- 01065 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transfer Pursuant To Patent Pilot Program (CV-128), #15 the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01063-JLS-JDEx. (dta) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:21-cv-01063-GW-SHKx. (dta) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#14

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#13

(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Related Case(s). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#2

(#12) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: SA CV 21-01063-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case SA CV 21-01063-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17- 596 DOC(JDEx). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, upon Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marilyn Pham, Executive Assistant served under F.R.C.P. Rule 4. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596-DOC-JDEx. Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dta) The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01063-DOC-JDEx. Signed by Judge David O. Carter Modified on 6/24/2021 (dta). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. Amended Notice of Related Cases Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-596; 8:17-cv-00674; 2:17-cv- 02945; 2:17-cv- 02948; 2:17-cv-02951; 2:17-cv- 02953; 2:17-cv-02959; 2:17-cv- 02968; 2:21-cv-04912; 2:21-cv-04914; 2:21-cv-04942; 8:21-cv- 01065 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transfer Pursuant To Patent Pilot Program (CV-128), #15 the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01063-JLS-JDEx. (dta) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:21-cv-01063-GW-SHKx. (dta) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Related Case(s). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481482 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where D-Link Systems, Inc. is a litigant