This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 11:33:16 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. Belkin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Belkin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04914

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

XR Communications, LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendant

Belkin International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James N Pickens

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: LA CV 21-04914-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case LA CV 21-04914-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17-596 DOC(JDEx), (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04914 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-596; 8:17-cv-00674; 2:17-cv- 02945; 2:17-cv- 02948; 2:17-cv-02951; 2:17-cv- 02953; 2:17-cv-02959; 2:17-cv- 02968; 8:21-cv-01063; 2:21-cv-04912; 2:21-cv-04942; 8:21-cv- 01065 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#14

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Belkin International, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#13

(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: Please put Central District of California full spelling. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#11

(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#9

(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#6

(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: LA CV 21-04914-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case LA CV 21-04914-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17-596 DOC(JDEx), (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04914 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-596; 8:17-cv-00674; 2:17-cv- 02945; 2:17-cv- 02948; 2:17-cv-02951; 2:17-cv- 02953; 2:17-cv-02959; 2:17-cv- 02968; 8:21-cv-01063; 2:21-cv-04912; 2:21-cv-04942; 8:21-cv- 01065 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Belkin International, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: Please put Central District of California full spelling. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481351 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James N. Pickens